List of Speaker of the Lok Sabha After Independent
(EdduLite)
List of Speaker of the Lok Sabha After Independent
The institutions of Speaker and Deputy Speaker originated in India in 1921 under the provisions of the Government of India Act of 1919. At that time, the Speaker and the Deputy Speaker were called the President and Deputy President respectively. The Government of India Act of 1935 changed the nomenclatures of President and Deputy President of the Central Legislative Assembly to the Speaker and Deputy Speaker respectively.
The first Speaker :- Frederick Whyte in 1921
The First Indian elected Speaker :- Vithalbhai J. Patel in 1925
Sl.No. |
Prime Minister Name |
Term Of The Office |
Party & Remarks |
|
1 |
Ganesh Vasudev Mavalankar |
15 May 1952 to 27 February 1956 |
1st Lok Sabha Speaker Of India |
|
2 |
M. A. Ayyangar |
8 March 1956 to 10 May 1957 11 May 1957 to 16 April 1962 |
|
|
3 |
Hukam Singh |
17 April 1962 to 16 March 1967 |
|
|
4 |
Neelam Sanjiva Reddy |
17 March 1967 to 19 July 1969 |
|
|
5 |
Gurdial Singh Dhillon |
8 August 1969 to 19 March 1971 22 March 1971 to 1 December 1975 |
|
|
6 |
Bali Ram Bhagat |
15 January 1976 to 25 March 1977 |
|
|
4(2nd) |
Neelam Sanjiva Reddy |
26 March 1977 to 13 July 1977 |
|
|
7 |
Kowdoor Sadananda Hegde |
21 July 1977 to 21 January 1980 |
|
|
8 |
Balram Jakhar |
22 January 1980 to 27 October 1984 16 January 1985 to 18 December 1989 |
|
|
9 |
Rabi Ray |
19 December 1989 to 9 July 1991 |
|
|
10 |
Shivraj Patil |
10 July 1991 to 22 May 1996 |
|
|
11 |
Purno Agitok Sangma |
23 May 1996 to 23 March 1998 |
|
|
12 |
Ganti Mohana Chandra Balayogi |
24 March 1998 to 19 October 1999 22 October 1999 to 3 March 2002 |
|
|
13 |
Manohar Joshi |
10 May 2002 to 2 June 2004 |
|
|
14 |
Somnath Chatterjee |
4 June 2004 to 31 May 2009 |
|
|
15 |
Meira Kumar |
4 June 2009 to 4 June 2014 |
|
|
16 |
Sumitra Mahajan |
6 June 2014 to 16 June 2019 |
|
|
17 |
Om Birla |
19 June 2019 to Present |
|
|
(EdduLite)
You May Like
Post a Comment